+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-46).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-46).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-46) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on TRANSPORTATION
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 89 - 29-A section 2076, sub-section 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor