+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- LD 507 In Senate, June 19, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 IN FAVOR and 15 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- On OBJECTION of Representative FREDETTE of Newport REMOVED.
- The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 179
- (Yeas 80 - Nays 61 - Absent 9 - Excused 1)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ ONCEUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
May 30, 2017: ACC OUGHT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 61
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9