+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On March 10, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP
On February 22, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - ONTP
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
On July 13, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
- Carry Over Requested
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor