+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (64)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- The House INSISTED on PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) as Amended by House Amendment "C" (H-669) thereto.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 686 Yeas 16 - Nays 18 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- Motion by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland The Senate RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "C" (H-669) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) was READ and ADOPTED.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
- Later today assigned.
- Speaker laid before the House
- On motion of Representative STUCKEY of Portland, the House RECEDED.
- On further motion of same Representative, House Amendment "B" (H-653) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 623
- (Yeas 81 - Nays 68 - Absent 2 - Excused 0)
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) as Amended by House Amendment "C" (H-669) thereto was ADOPTED.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) as Amended by House Amendment "C" (H-669) thereto.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 656 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
- On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "B" (H-653) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) was READ and ADOPTED.
- On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-608).
- On motion of Representative STUCKEY of Portland, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-608).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-653) thereto ADOPTED.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-653) thereto
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
- On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
- Representative McCABE of Skowhegan REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- RELEASED.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Reports READ
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 565 Yeas 16 - Nays 17 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- Motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Minority Ought to Pass As Amended As Amended By Committee Amendment "B" (H-609) Report ACCEPTED, In NON-CONCURRENCE FAILED
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) in concurrence
- HELD at the Request of Senator MASON of Androscoggin.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) READ and ADOPTED
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- (Yeas 82 - Nays 65 - Absent 4 - Excused 0)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 526
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-608) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-608).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 14, 2016: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2016: ADOPT HCH-669 TO CAH-608
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 68
- Absent: 2
April 12, 2016: INSIST
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 17
March 30, 2016: ACCEPT MIN OTP-B RPT
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 1
March 29, 2016: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 65
- Absent: 4