+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-8).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ a SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-8)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-8) READ and ADOPTEDASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Collins of York REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- Reported by Senator COLLINS of York for the Maine Turnpike Authority pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 23, section 1961, subsection 6.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor