+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- Chapter 43 - 10 section
- Chapter 43 - 10 section 1461
- Chapter 43 - 10 section 1462
- Chapter 43 - 10 section 1463
- Chapter 43 - 10 section 1464
- Chapter 43 - 10 section 1466
- Chapter 43 - 10 section 1465
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor