+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- FINALLY PASSED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-75).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-75)
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-75) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed