+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- ROLL CALL NO. 791V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- LD 440 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 30 In the Affirmative and 5 In the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- 111 having voted in the affirmative and 35 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-548).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 722
- (Yeas 98 - Nays 45 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (S-548).
- Committee Amendment "B" (S-548) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York.
- On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 143 - Nays 0 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 58
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-24).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-24).
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-24) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION
- Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 599 - 36 section 5219-KK
+ − Votes (4)
May 1, 2014: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 35
- Absent: 5
May 1, 2014: VETO OVERRIDE (2/3)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 5
April 17, 2014: Enactment
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 45
- Absent: 8
April 30, 2013: Enactment
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 8