+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On July 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-366) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-366) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-366).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-366) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On April 12, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on February 9, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 464 - 20-A section 1001, sub-section 16