+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (48)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- ROLL CALL NO. 75V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- 88 having voted in the affirmative and 55 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- PREVAILED
- (24 -Yeas, 11 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 49
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered)
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- On motion of Representative FREDETTE of Newport, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 40
- (Yeas 89 - Nays 57 - Absent 5 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE.
- PREVAILED
- (23 -Yeas, 12 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 33
- On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox, the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT.
- Reports READ.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- READ the Second Time.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- On motion of Representative WILLETTE of Mapleton, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative THERIAULT of Madawaska, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 7
- (Yeas 84 - Nays 52 - Absent 15 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Mazurek of Knox, REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Votes (5)
May 7, 2013: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 8
April 24, 2013: ENACTMENT
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
April 23, 2013: Enactment
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 57
- Absent: 5
April 4, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ OTP RPT
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
March 14, 2013: ACC MAJ OUGHT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 52
- Absent: 15