+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis, REFERRED to the Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife, in concurrence.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
- Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 42 - 12 section 10953, sub-section 1-C
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor