+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 16, 2020 in the House:
- Died in Possession of the Committee Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES. (DEAD)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HERBIG of Waldo The Majority REFER to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS Report ACCEPTED in concurrence AND The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
- Reports READ
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
- On motion of Representative DAUGHTRY of Brunswick, the Majority REFER to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS.
- Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- Chapter null - 20-A section
- Chapter null - 36 section 5217-D, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter null - 36 section 5122, sub-section 2, paragraph QQ
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12945
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12942
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12943
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12941
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12944
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor