+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-73), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-73) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-73).
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 52 - 29-A section 521, sub-section 9-A
- Chapter 52 - 29-A section 521, sub-section 9-B
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor