+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- Chapter 19 - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 74-D
- Chapter 19 - 25 section 1531
- Chapter 19 - 25 section 1532
- Chapter 19 - 25 section 1533, sub-section 2
- Chapter 19 - 25 section 1535
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor