+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (67)
On May 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature (Emergency Measure)
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "C" (S-476) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-591) thereto.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "C" (S-476) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-591) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Committee Amendment "C" (S-476) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-591) thereto ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-591) to Committee Amendment "C" (S-476) READ and ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "C" (S-476) was ADOPTED
- On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "C" (S-476)
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reports Read
- On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "C" (S-476) Report ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "C" (S-476) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "C" (S-476)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "C" (S-476) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "C" (S-476).
On March 29, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/OTP-AM
On March 4, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot the Bill and accompanying papers were COMMITTED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Reports READ.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Bill and accompanying papers COMMITTED to the Committee on Health and Human Services
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 30, 2021 in the joint:
- Referred To - HHS
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
- Unfinished Business
- Taken from the table by the President
- On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Committee Amendment "B" (S-98) READ
- On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-291) to Committee Amendment "B" (S-98)
- Roll Call Ordered
- On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland to ADOPT Senate Amendment "A" (S-291) to Committee Amendment "B" (S-98) Roll Call Ordered
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Reports READ
On May 18, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/OTP-AM
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 9, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 8, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 746 - 22 section 3174-T
- Chapter 746 - 22 section 3174-G, sub-section 1, paragraph D
- Chapter 746 - 22 section 3174-G, sub-section 1, paragraph B
+ − Sponsors (4)
Anne CARNEY
Type:
Primary Sponsor