+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-49).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-49).
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-49) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- Chapter null - 24-A section 6603, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2808-B, sub-section 2, paragraph E
- Chapter null - 24-A section 6603, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 24-A section 6603, sub-section 1, paragraph D
- Chapter 96 - 24-A section 6603, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 96 - 24-A section 2808-B, sub-section 2, paragraph E
- Chapter 96 - 24-A section 6603, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 96 - 24-A section 6603, sub-section 1, paragraph D
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor