+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-170).
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-170)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-170) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY
- Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor