+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-373) thereto.
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- On further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) thereto
- On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) thereto was ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-373) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-373) thereto ADOPTED
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-373) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Sent down for concurrence
- On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) was ADOPTED
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) was READ.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) thereto.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) was READ and ADOPTED.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) READ
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Taken from the table by the President
- On motion by Senator MOORE of Washington Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) READ and ADOPTED
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) thereto ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-78) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-100) thereto
- Sent down for concurrence
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
- Senator MILLETT of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter 556 - 20-A section 6602, sub-section 1, paragraph D
- Chapter 556 - 20-A section 6602, sub-section 2
- Chapter 556 - 20-A section 6602, sub-section 4, paragraph A
- Chapter 556 - 20-A section 6602, sub-section 1, paragraph E
- Chapter 556 - 20-A section 6602, sub-section 1, paragraph F
- Chapter 556 - 20-A section 6602, sub-section 1, paragraph G
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor