+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-95) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-95) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-95).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-95) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 17 section 1836, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 63 - 17 section 1836, sub-section 3-A
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor