+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- (Yeas 81 - Nays 62 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) thereto.
- ROLL CALL NO. 390
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) READ and ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) was ADOPTED
- On motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-651)
- On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENACTED
- RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 584.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-340) thereto ADOPTED
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 17, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) in concurrence
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- (Yeas 84 - Nays 55 - Absent 12 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 300
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-651) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-651).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On June 1, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On May 27, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 25, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on February 4, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 402 - 35-A section 10126, sub-section 3
- Chapter 402 - 35-A section 10126, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 402 - 35-A section 10125, sub-section 1, paragraph 1
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2021: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 62
- Absent: 8
June 15, 2021: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor