+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
- Subsequently Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) READ
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) thereto READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) thereto
- On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) READ and ADOPTED
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) was READ.
- Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) thereto ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-203) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-251) thereto.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Report
- Report READ
On June 7, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On May 10, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on February 4, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (4)
Harold STEWART
Type:
Primary Sponsor