+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 35
- (Yeas 144 - Nays 1 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-80) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-80).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reports Read
- On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 142 Yeas 33 - Nays 1 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-80) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-80) in concurrence
On April 20, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 18, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on February 4, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter null - 30-A section 5681, sub-section 5
+ − Votes (2)
April 28, 2021: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 144
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 6
April 28, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor