+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On July 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence.
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 275 16 Yeas - 19 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
- Reports READ
- motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to accept Report "B" Ought to Pass As Amended Report FAILED
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 274 13 Yeas - 22 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent Acceptance of Report C Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
- READ ONCE
- Subsequently, Report A Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-243) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-243) , in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- (Yeas 80 - Nays 67 - Absent 4 - Excused 0)
- Speaker laid before the House
- ROLL CALL NO. 262
- Subsequently, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-243) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-243).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- (Yeas 79 - Nays 66 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 137
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended .
- Representative GATTINE of Westbrook moved to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended .
- Reports READ.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 356 - 22 section 3173-G
+ − Votes (4)
June 17, 2015: ACCEPT RPT 'B' OTP-A
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 22
June 17, 2015: ACCEPT RPT 'C' ONTP
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 19
June 16, 2015: Acc Report 'A' OTP as Amend
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 67
- Absent: 4
June 2, 2015: TABLE UNTIL LATER
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 66
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor