+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On May 17, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP
On April 16, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - ONTP
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on February 4, 2021.