+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-449) thereto in concurrence
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- On further motion of the same Representative, under further SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-191).
- On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, under SUSPENSION of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-191).
- On further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-449) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-449) thereto was ADOPTED.
- Subsequently, the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-449) thereto.
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Reports READ.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reports Read
- On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-191)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 233
- (Yeas 80 - Nays 63 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-191) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-191).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY
- Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 5, 2017: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 63
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor