+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-365) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-365) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 145 Yeas 20 - Nays 15 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-365) Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- (Yeas 81 - Nays 59 - Absent 8 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 131
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-365).
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-365) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 20-A section 2405, sub-section 9
- Chapter null - 20-A section 2405, sub-section 10
- Chapter 307 - 20-A section 2405, sub-section 9
- Chapter 307 - 20-A section 2405, sub-section 10
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2019: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
May 28, 2019: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 59
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor