+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-31), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-31) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-31).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (18)
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4312, sub-section 3, paragraph J
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4312, sub-section 3, paragraph K
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4326, sub-section 3-A, paragraph L
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4326, sub-section 3-A, paragraph J
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4326, sub-section 3-A, paragraph K
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4326, sub-section 1, paragraph H-1
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4301, sub-section 1-B
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4326, sub-section 3-A, paragraph G
- Chapter null - 30-A section 4312, sub-section 3, paragraph L
- Chapter 38 - 30-A section 4312, sub-section 3, paragraph J
- Chapter 38 - 30-A section 4312, sub-section 3, paragraph K
- Chapter 38 - 30-A section 4326, sub-section 3-A, paragraph L
- Chapter 38 - 30-A section 4326, sub-section 3-A, paragraph J
- Chapter 38 - 30-A section 4326, sub-section 3-A, paragraph K
- Chapter 38 - 30-A section 4326, sub-section 1, paragraph H-1
- Chapter 38 - 30-A section 4301, sub-section 1-B
- Chapter 38 - 30-A section 4326, sub-section 3-A, paragraph G
- Chapter 38 - 30-A section 4312, sub-section 3, paragraph L
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor