+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Hill of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Hill of York REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS