+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 16, 2020 in the House:
- Died in Possession of the House Upon Conclusion of the 129th Legislature and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES. (DEAD)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Sanborn of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence.
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
- Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- Chapter null - 22 section 8718
- Chapter null - 22 section 8715-A
- Chapter null - 22 section 8712, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 22 section 8712, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 22 section 8712, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 22 section 8703, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 22 section 42, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 30-B
- Chapter null - 22 section 3173
- Chapter null - 22 section 8719
- Chapter null - 22 section 8704, sub-section 1, paragraph A