+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (41)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On July 16, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over from the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE , in concurrence.
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- (Yeas 87 - Nays 56 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
- The Resolve was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-478).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reports READ
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 381
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- (Yeas 88 - Nays 55 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-500) thereto , in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) , in concurrence.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-500) thereto
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- ROLL CALL NO. 390
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-500) thereto ADOPTED.
- On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-500) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-478) was READ and ADOPTED.
- On further motion of the same Representative, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-478).
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-478).
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent forthwith to the Engrossing Division.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Representative GIDEON of Freeport moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation, in concurrence.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
- Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 23, 2015: Acc Maj OTP as Amended Rep
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 8
June 23, 2015: ADOPT C A AS AM BY HAH-500
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor