+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-132) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-132) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
- Reports Read
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-132) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-132).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 10, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM/ONTP
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 17, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 28, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor