+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- (Yeas 103 - Nays 33 - Absent 15 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 454
- In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House being necessary, a total was taken.
- Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- (Yeas 99 - Nays 37 - Absent 15 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 453
- On motion of Representative HARVELL of Farmington, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
- HELD at the Request of Representative HARVELL of Farmington.
- FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-368) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) READ and ADOPTED
- TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York.
- On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-503)
- On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-503)
- On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-368) thereto READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-368) thereto
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-368) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-503) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-503), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-503)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Lachowicz of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
July 9, 2013: RECONSIDER
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 15
July 9, 2013: ENACTMENT - MANDATE
- Yeas: 103
- Nays: 33
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor