+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Reports READ.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED
- Reports READ
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 994.
On July 16, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 994.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Subsequently, On motion by Senator Hamper of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS
- Taken from the table by the President
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor