+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-11).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-11).
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-11) READ and ADOPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Haskell of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION
- Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor