+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- 77 having voted in the affirmative and 67 in the negative, with 6 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 44V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought to Pass Report READ and ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
- READ ONCE
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- READ the Second Time.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary. Report Accepted.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- in concurrence
- REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Vote
April 25, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 67
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6