+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-497) thereto, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-497) thereto ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- House Amendment "A" (H-497) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) READ.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) was READ.
- On motion of Representative KUMIEGA of Deer Isle, House Amendment "A" (H-497) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) was READ and ADOPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 321
- (Yeas 111 - Nays 34 - Absent 6 - Excused 0)
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-476) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-497) thereto ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee "A" (H-476) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-497) thereto.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative KUMIEGA of Deer Isle, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report.
- The Committee Report was READ.
- On OBJECTION of Representative KUMIEGA of Deer Isle REMOVED.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
- Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- Chapter 323 - 22 section 2511, sub-section 41-A
- Chapter 323 - 22 section 2511, sub-section 45-A
- Chapter 323 - 22 section 2514, sub-section 1, paragraph G-1
- Chapter 323 - 22 section 2515
- Chapter 323 - 22 section 2517-C
- Chapter 323 - 22 section 2518
+ − Vote
June 13, 2013: ADOPT HAH-497 TO CAH-476
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 34
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor