+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-390).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-390)
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-390) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 614 - 8 section 1020, sub-section 1
- Chapter 614 - 8 section 1020, sub-section 4
- Chapter 614 - 8 section 1001, sub-section 2
- Chapter 614 - 8 section 1001, sub-section 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor