+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (42)
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-26) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-26) in concurrence
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
- Senator MILLETT of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Reports READ
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-26).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-26) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 20-A section 10952, sub-section 7
- Chapter 487 - 20-A section 10952, sub-section 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor