+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-174), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-174) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-174)
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 160 - 14 section 8601