+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On July 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-56) READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-56).
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-56).
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 25, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 25, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 671 - 30-A section 4722, sub-section 1, paragraph DD
- Chapter 671 - 36 section 5219-BB, sub-section 1, paragraph C