+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 580 - 22 section 567, sub-section 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor