+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
On March 23, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP
On March 7, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP
- Work Session Held
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on February 28, 2022.
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 573 - 30-A section 757, sub-section 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor