+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (52)
On September 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 601.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FINAL PASSAGE In NON-CONCURRENCE 2/3 Vote Required
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 77 - Nays 62 - Absent 11 - Excused 1)
- ROLL CALL NO. 187
- This being a Constitutional Amendment, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present being necessary, a total was taken.
- FAILED FINAL PASSAGE.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending FINAL PASSAGE.
- Unfinished Business
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-133) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-133) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence
- READ ONCE
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 134 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- Motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford to ACCEPT The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED
- Reports READ
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- (Yeas 78 - Nays 65 - Absent 7 - Excused 1)
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 89
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The RESOLUTION was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-133) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-133).
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2017: Final Passage - Con Res
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 62
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 11
May 16, 2017: ACCEPT MIN ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 19
May 11, 2017: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 65
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor