+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-190) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-190), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-190).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
On January 2, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 29-A section 2302
- Chapter null - 29-A section 2301, sub-section 5-C
- Chapter 413 - 29-A section 2302
- Chapter 413 - 29-A section 2301, sub-section 5-C
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor