+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-815), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-815) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-815)
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs, in concurrence.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter 561 - 20-A section 5205, sub-section 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor