+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-671) In NON-CONCURRENCE
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw his request for a Roll Call.
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Senator Davis of Piscataquis Requested a Roll Call
- Reports Read
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-671) READ and ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-671) In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Sent down for concurrence
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 82 - Nays 66 - Absent 3 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 537
- On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Davis of Piscataquis REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative MARTIN for the Joint Standing Committee on State and Local Government pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 12006, subsection 2 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (99)
- Chapter null - 35-A section 10103, sub-section 4-A, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 12 section 405-A, sub-section 3, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8234
- Chapter null - 12 section 6035
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 36-D
- Chapter null - 22 section 328, sub-section 17-A, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-L, sub-section 10
- Chapter null - 20-A section
- Chapter null - 12 section 405-A, sub-section 3, paragraph C
- Chapter null - 25 section 2952, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 5 section
- Chapter null - 22 section 272, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-C, sub-section 9
- Chapter null - 25 section 2957
- Chapter null - 25 section 2956, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8233, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 24-A section 6951, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 7 section 353
- Chapter null - 22 section 272, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 32 section
- Chapter null - 12 section 405-A, sub-section 3, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 2-E
- Chapter null - 5 section 15303, sub-section 6-B
- Chapter null - 5 section 1547, sub-section 7
- Chapter null - 12 section 6176
- Chapter null - 34-A section
- Chapter null - 25 section 2955, paragraph 1
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8233, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 25 section 2955, paragraph 2
- Chapter null - 12 section 6034
- Chapter null - 38 section
- Chapter null - 5 section 55-A
- Chapter null - 12 section 10156
- Chapter null - 22 section 271, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-G, sub-section 30-D
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 22-B
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 23-B
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-G, sub-section 10-E
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 30-A
- Chapter null - 24-A section 6951, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 38 section 343-D
- Chapter null - 5 section 55
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8237
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8236, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 35-A section 10103, sub-section 4-A, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 25 section 2955, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-G, sub-section 4-B
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 4-C
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-K, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 22 section 256-B, sub-section 1, paragraph K
- Chapter null - 22 section 8708-A
- Chapter null - 38 section 353-A, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 4-B
- Chapter null - 10 section 8001, sub-section 38, paragraph K
- Chapter null - 25 section 2954
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8235
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-A, sub-section 11
- Chapter null - 25 section 2958
- Chapter null - 20-A section 8232, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 7 section 352
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-I, sub-section 57-E
- Chapter null - 5 section 12004-G, sub-section 3-D
- Chapter null - 24-A section 6952
- Chapter null - 10 section 949, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 34-A section 3002-B
- Chapter null - 38 section 999
- Chapter null - 32 section 9903
- Chapter null - 32 section 9913
- Chapter null - 34-A section 11404
- Chapter null - 32 section 9901
- Chapter null - 32 section 9904
- Chapter null - 38 section 1000
- Chapter null - 32 section 9912
- Chapter null - 38 section 994
- Chapter null - 32 section 9915
- Chapter null - 34-A section 11403
- Chapter null - 38 section 991
- Chapter null - 32 section 9908
- Chapter null - 38 section 1002
- Chapter null - 38 section 993
- Chapter null - 38 section 996
- Chapter null - 32 section 9909
- Chapter null - 34-A section 11401
- Chapter null - 38 section 997
- Chapter null - 32 section 9902
- Chapter null - 32 section 9910
- Chapter null - 20-A section 12901
- Chapter null - 5 section 13104
- Chapter null - 34-A section 11402
- Chapter null - 32 section 9906
- Chapter null - 34-A section 11405
- Chapter null - 38 section 998
- Chapter null - 32 section 9914
- Chapter null - 5 section 13103
- Chapter null - 32 section 9911
- Chapter null - 38 section 995
- Chapter null - 38 section 992
- Chapter null - 38 section 1001
- Chapter null - 32 section 9907
+ − Vote
March 27, 2018: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 66
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
MARTIN
Type:
Primary Sponsor