+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-117) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-325) thereto.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-117) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-325) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-117) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-325) thereto ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-325) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-117) READ and ADOPTED
- Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-117) was ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-117)
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-117), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-117) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-117).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 37-B section 513
- Chapter null - 37-B section 513-A
- Chapter 504 - 37-B section 513
- Chapter 504 - 37-B section 513-A
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor