+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-636) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-636), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-636).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
- Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter null - 18-B section 105, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 18-B section 813, sub-section 6
- Chapter 349 - 18-B section 105, sub-section 3
- Chapter 349 - 18-B section 813, sub-section 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor