+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature (Emergency Measure)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-639), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-639) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-639).
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill and accompanying papers REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative DUCHESNE for the Joint Standing Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife pursuant to Joint Order 2017, H.P. 1250 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 12 section 11161, sub-section 2
- Chapter 366 - 12 section 11161, sub-section 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor