+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Dow of Lincoln REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION
- Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
- Representative TIPPING for the Joint Standing Committee on Taxation pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 3, section 999, subsection 4 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 36 section 5219-HH, sub-section 1, paragraph J
- Chapter 339 - 36 section 5219-HH, sub-section 1, paragraph J
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor